PROVIDENCE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides housing for local elderly people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 02 July 1964: Standard registration
- PROVIDENCE HOMES CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM GEORGE CHARITY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Fiona Marvell | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Blessett | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Johanna Elizabeth Jones | Trustee | 15 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Anthony Ledger | Trustee | 09 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PHILLIP DAVID BLESSETT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.17k | £31.22k | £32.96k | £33.51k | £55.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.81k | £7.94k | £22.08k | £16.34k | £68.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 18 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 27 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 27 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2020
(These accounts |
03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST 1/7/1958; SUPPLEMENTARY DEED OF TRUST 4/1/1961.
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF HOMES FOR TWELVE PERSONS CONSISTING OF MARRIED COUPLES, SPINSTERS OR WIDOWS (WITHOUT FAMILIES) NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE WHO SHALL BE PERSONS IN INDIGENT AND NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES OF GOOD CHARACTER AND MORAL WORTH WHO HAVE RESIDED IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEEPING SAINT JAMES FOR AT LEAST TWO YEARS.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEEPING ST. JAMES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
30A EASTGATE
DEEPING ST. JAMES
PETERBOROUGH
PE6 8HJ
- Phone:
- 07846615782
- Email:
- jonhunt833@gmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window