OUR LADY'S HOMESTEAD AT NYMPSFIELD IN THE COUNTY OF GLOUCESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is dormant in the period
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Duke | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Rev AUGUSTINE UZOMA IHEDINMA | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
SISTER STELLA ENEIBI DAVIES | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
Sister Blessing Ogechi Onuoha | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|||||||
MARIAN MISSION FOR THE POOR | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 12 November 2020 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF TRUST DATED 29/3/1932 AND VARIED BY SCHEME DATED 30 MARCH 1998. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 19 DEC 2019
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH RELIGIOUS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION WITH THE PARISH OF NYMPSFIELD
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Marian Missionary Sisters otP
Marian Mission for the Poor
1 Colchester Road
Leyton
London
E10 6HA
- Phone:
- 01453860228
- Email:
- marianmission@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window