DONCASTER UNITARIAN AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCH TRUST FUND AND PROPERTIES HELD IN CONNEXION THEREWITH

Charity number: 234788
Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Church services are on Sundays at 11am (although during the Coronavirus crisis, we are holding services online at 3pm instead). We hold coffee mornings, open days, meditation sessions, and social events to raise awareness of Unitarianism and to raise funds. The church also fundraises through its charity shop on Hall Gate. We support a number of local organisations to help vulnerable communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020

Total income: £30,304
Total expenditure: £29,511

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Doncaster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 November 1966: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • DONCASTER FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCH TRUST (UNITARIAN) TRUST FUND AND PROPERTIES HELD IN CONNEXION THEREWITH (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARION BAKER Trustee 25 February 2024
TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH UPPER CHAPEL
Received: On time
WILLIAM FISHER
Received: On time
MINISTERS' PENSION FUND
Received: On time
THE NIGHTINGALE CENTRE (UNITARIAN)
Received: 55 days late
SHEFFIELD & DISTRICT ASSOCIATION Trustee 06 December 2011
None on record
JOSEPHINE COPLEY Trustee
None on record
MARIAN HUGHES Trustee
None on record
JOHN FOSTER Trustee
None on record
NEVILLE WELLS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £40.34k £41.78k £34.20k £31.33k £30.30k
Total expenditure £53.52k £49.17k £71.61k £46.65k £29.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 188 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 554 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 919 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 March 2022 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 15 March 2022 135 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 March 2022 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 March 2022 500 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED P.P.R. 15 AUGUST 1958
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS TO BE AWARDED TO THE BOY AND GIRL ANNUALLY ADJUDGED TO BE THE MOST REGULAR IN ATTENDANCE AND MOST CONSISTENT IN BEHAVIOUR AT THE SUNDAY SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 November 1966 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
DONCASTER UNITARIAN
AND FREE CHRISTIAN CHURCH
60A HALLGATE
DONCASTER
DN1 3PB
Phone:
01302340872