Financial history THE LAW MEMORIAL HOUSES

Charity number: 234795
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £43.25k £42.42k £42.75k £47.98k £30.40k
Total expenditure £45.72k £32.79k £18.56k £14.80k £15.94k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A