ST JOHN'S LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of hardship for the poor and distressed
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 September 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR RAJU GORANIA | Trustee | 02 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY ANDREW GILL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD STEWART JELLY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.96k | £1.58k | £1.65k | £2.10k | £2.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £287 | £342 | £201 | £361 | £847 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH APRIL 1964
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED BROTHER MASONS AND THEIR POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR ORGANISATIONS OR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS, OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE LODGE SHALL DIRECT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
51 DALBY AVENUE
BUSHBY
LEICESTER
LE7 9RE
- Phone:
- 01162414960
- Email:
- amgill@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window