THE GEORGE GIBSON ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The foundations objectives are to provide and maintain almshouses and to assist the poor and old people resident in the former administrative county of West Suffolk. It does this by: providing almshouses at George Gibson Close in Exning, supporting the work of the Newmarket Day Centre, supporting the building of the Exning Court very sheltered housing project in conjunction with Hereward Housing,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 06 August 1964: Standard registration
- 03 August 2021: Removed (Removed by application)
- 03 August 2021: Funds transferred to 1176924 THE GEORGE GIBSON ALMSHOUSES FOUNDATION TRUST
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £411.34k | £437.15k | £477.37k | £420.12k | £420.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £206.03k | £194.90k | £311.90k | £372.27k | £475.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 24 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 28 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED THE 31ST MARCH 1959
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR AGED AND INFIRM PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF WEST SUFFOLK.
Area of benefit
THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF WEST SUFFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window