GEORGE YEOMAN HEATH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides monetary awards to nurses who have completed their training within the Newcastle Hospitals Trust and who have excelled at both the written examinations and their practical work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 15 July 1964: Standard registration
- THE HEATH BEQUEST (Working name)
- THE HEATH TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peta Jane Greaves | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Alison Isabel Machin | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Ian Joy | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynsay Tait | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Macfarlane-Reid | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23k | £3.28k | £3.49k | £4.07k | £4.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 16 November 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 22 MAY 1903 AND SCHEME OF 23 NOVEMBER 1906
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PRIZES FOR NURSES AND TO MAKE PART PAYMENTS OF PREMIUMS PAID BY NURSES TO THE ROYAL NATIONAL PENSION FUND FOR NURSES.
Area of benefit
NEWCASTLE-UPON-TYNE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 Green Close
Stannington
Morpeth
NE61 6PE
- Phone:
- 01670789186
- Email:
- dragone.smart@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window