Accounts and annual returns CHARITY OF MRS E M DEGACHER

Charity Number: 234835
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2008 21 February 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2007 21 February 2009 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2004 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2004 Not submitted