Trustees DEAN ROW UNITARIAN CHAPEL FUNDS HELD ICW
Charity number: 234851

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Dennell | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Deborah Julia White | Trustee | 17 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Booth | Trustee | 07 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Aspeotis | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Weigh | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Wenham | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Earp | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Beryl Booth | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JENIFER DORIS WILLIAMS | Trustee | 21 August 2011 |
|
|||||
ANNE GEMMELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER GEORGE SHAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
CATHERINE SMEATON | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS CHRISSIE WILKIE | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.