BROWN'S CHARITY FOR POOR

Charity number: 234865
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

PROVIDE SUPPORT FOR THE POOR OF THE PARISH FROM FUNDS RAISED FROM LAND RENTAL AND FUNDS GIVEN FROM ANOTHER CHARITY

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £2,942
Total expenditure: £2,166

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • REV ROBERT BROWN'S CHARITY FOR THE POOR (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Julia Chamberlin Trustee 31 January 2024
ROBERT BROWN SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Rev Peter Streete Trustee 31 January 2024
ROBERT BROWN SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
Donald Mayes Trustee 26 November 2021
ROBERT BROWN SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time
DOROTHY KENDALL Trustee 08 October 2013
None on record
HELEN SIMONE MORTIMER Trustee
ROBERT BROWN SCHOOL TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.56k £2.31k £2.22k £2.03k £2.94k
Total expenditure £2.68k £1.71k £2.25k £1.79k £2.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 19 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 23 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
PUMP COTTAGE
THE STREET
BESSINGHAM
NORWICH
NR11 7JR
Phone:
01263577782
Website:

No information available