THE FIRE SERVICE RESEARCH AND TRAINING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes and assists research aimed at protecting life and property from fire and promotes and assists training of fire service personnel to secure and improve the efficiency and effectiveness of the fire service as a whole.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Scott | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cashin | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr roger Harrison | Trustee | 23 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alasdaire Hay | Trustee | 08 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Des Tidbury QFSM | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor paresh Wankhade | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Fraser Ledgerton Lynch | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £155.25k | £164.91k | £173.39k | £190.33k | £206.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £57.78k | £153.89k | £41.03k | £22.03k | £208.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 12 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2021
(These accounts |
01 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27TH AUGUST 1940 (UV 278 P 547)AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST RESEARCH INTO THE METHODS OF THE EXTINCTION OF FIRES AND THE PROTECTION OF LIFE AND PROPERTY IN THE CASE OF FIRE, TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE TRAINING OF FIRE BRIGADE PERSONNEL AND TO SECURE THE STANDARDISATION OF, AND IMPROVEMENTS IN APPLIANCES OF VALUE TO THE FIRE SERVICES AND GENERALLY TO SECURE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF FIRE SERVICES AS A WHOLE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fire Protection Association
London Road
Morton in Marsh
Gloucestershire
GL56 0RH
- Phone:
- 01608 812511
- Email:
- info@firetrust.info
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window