Friends of Chalfonts & GX Community Hospital

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide funds to generally support the charitable work of the hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 May 1964: Standard registration
- CHALFONTS AND GERRARDS CROSS HOSPITAL LEAGUE OF FRIENDS (Previous name)
- League of Friends - Chalfonts & Gerrards Cross Hospital (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARA SABINE | Chair |
|
||||||
Desmond Joseph Bray | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Michael Peck | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Angela Rosemarie Windsor | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE EVALYN SMITH | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jeffrey Coteman | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Graham Lister | Trustee | 16 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
WENDY NOWELL | Trustee | 25 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.72m | £22.78k | £24.36k | £50.44k | £89.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.93k | £7.31k | £6.08k | £7.26k | £8.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.71m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £271 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.71m | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £15.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.15k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 13 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 OCT 1955 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 OCT 1972 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 14 NOV 1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 OCT 2003 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO RELIEVE PATIENTS AND FORMER PATIENTS OF THE HOSPITAL WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED, INFIRM, AND GENERALLY TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE SAID HOSPITAL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
SHARROW WHIT
11a Denham Walk
Chalfont St. Peter
GERRARDS CROSS
SL9 0EN
- Phone:
- 01494872133
- Email:
- jeffcoteman@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window