Accounts and annual returns CHARITY ADMINISTERED IN CONNECTION WITH THE DAUGHTERS OF JESUS

Charity number: 234925
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 15 August 2014 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 02 October 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 30 July 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 29 November 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 09 August 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2011 16 January 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 19 August 2011 On Time