THE BISHOP TRUST

Charity number: 234930
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making donations/gifts to needy former employees on low income.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £2,488
Total expenditure: £11,155

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • BISHOP CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sam Cortese Trustee 27 November 2019
None on record
ALAN REGINALD COTTIS Trustee 05 July 2011
None on record
THOMAS PATRICK COURTNEY Trustee
None on record
MARTYN J DADDS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £1.36k £1.13k £772 £1.24k £2.49k
Total expenditure £11.23k £10.28k £12.03k £11.60k £11.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 20 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 23 April 2024 78 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 05 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 16 March 2021 39 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
34 THE MEAD
WEST WICKHAM
BR4 0BB
Phone:
02087761008
Website:

No information available