ARCHIBALD WORTHINGTON COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SPORT/RECREATION, GENERAL PUBLIC/MANKIND PROVIDES BUILDINGS/FACILITIES/OPEN SPACE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £12,051 from 4 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Shropshire
Governance
- 13 February 1968: Standard registration
- ARCHIBALD WORTHINGTON CLUB WHITCHURCH (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND RIDGEWAY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
PAUL GOLLINS | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD YATES | Trustee | 07 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.97k | £41.03k | £31.91k | £40.26k | £27.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.47k | £51.08k | £38.11k | £39.48k | £23.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | £10.00k | £12.05k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 463 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 828 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 1 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY HALL FOR USE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR: A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WHITCHURCH AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ARCHIBALD WORKING MENS CLUB
CASTLE HILL
WHITCHURCH
SY13 1BQ
- Phone:
- 01948 662095
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window