WILLIAM RATHBONE FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Small family grant giving charity, empowered to give donations to any charitable body or institution with charitable purposes. It concentrates its grants on those charities in which the trustees or the settlors take or have taken a personal interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Canada
Governance
- 03 June 1963: Standard registration
- W AND P RATHBONE CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM RATHBONE OBE | Chair | 05 April 1964 |
|
|
||||
ELENA ANNE HOLETON | Trustee | 31 December 2003 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM RATHBONE XI | Trustee | 31 December 2003 |
|
|
||||
LUCY ELENA ADDYMAN | Trustee | 22 June 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.73k | £6.71k | £7.89k | £6.58k | £7.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.41k | £8.55k | £9.96k | £3.21k | £7.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 03 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 04 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 29 February 2024 | 390 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 13 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 APRIL 1964 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 15 OCTOBER 1994
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES AT THE DISCRETION OF THE SETTLOR DURING HIS LIFETIME AND AFTER AT THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BRYNMAER ROAD
LONDON
SW11 4EN
- Phone:
- 02079781938
- Email:
- bill.rathbone@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window