ST COLUMBA'S PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND NORTH SHIELDS (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)

Charity number: 235022
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Flower arrangement fund

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £127
Total expenditure: £118

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • North Tyneside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 October 1966: Standard registration
  • 16 May 2006: Removed (Funds spent up (s.75))
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter Alexander Taylor Trustee 28 April 2024
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Elizabeth Dorothy Morrell Trustee 30 April 2023
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Shirley McKay Trustee 30 April 2023
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Veronica Ann Hall Trustee 01 May 2022
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Lisa Stoker Trustee 01 May 2022
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Norma Evelyn McAvoy Trustee 21 April 2021
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Jill Thompson Trustee 30 September 2020
None on record
Lesley Waugh Trustee 30 September 2020
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Barbara White Trustee 30 September 2020
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
Rev Trevor Jamison Trustee 16 June 2018
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
Alison Drew Trustee 23 April 2017
JANET DALL THOMSON CHARITY.
Received: On time
ST COLUMBA'S NORTH SHIELDS UNITED REFORMED CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £125 £101 £111 £125 £127
Total expenditure £123 £113 £106 £121 £118
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 10 March 2024 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL DATED 26TH JANUARY 1943 "AS AMENDED ON 6 JULY 1995 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993".
Charitable objects
FOR GENERAL CHURCH PURPOSES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 03 October 1966 : Standard registration
  • 16 May 2006 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
9 GREENHAUGH ROAD
SOUTH WELLFIELD
WHITLEY BAY
NE25 9HF
Phone:
01912514553
Website:

No information available