Trustees ST COLUMBA'S PRESBYTERIAN CHURCH OF ENGLAND NORTH SHIELDS (TRUST PROPERTY HELD IN CONNECTION WITH)
Charity number: 235022

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter Alexander Taylor | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Dorothy Morrell | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Shirley McKay | Trustee | 30 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Veronica Ann Hall | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Lisa Stoker | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Norma Evelyn McAvoy | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Jill Thompson | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Waugh | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Barbara White | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Rev Trevor Jamison | Trustee | 16 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Alison Drew | Trustee | 23 April 2017 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.