CHARITY OF JOHN MCKIE ELLIOTT DECEASED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing funds for visually impaired persons living in the Gateshead and Neewcastle upon tyne area.Through grants and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
Governance
- 07 August 1964: Standard registration
- 09 June 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
- THE JOHN MCKIE ELLIOT TRUST FOR THE BLIND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29k | £1.31k | £888 | £1.05k | £1.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £470 | £2.70k | £13.75k | £300 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 17 February 2018 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 24 February 2017 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CHANCERY SCHEME OF 5 DECEMBER 1912
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE, SUPPORT OR EDUCATION OR OTHERWISE FOR THE BENEFIT OF BLIND PERSONS WHO ARE REPUTED TO BE RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE OR THE COUNTY BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD, AND WHO, IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES INTEND OR ARE LIKELY TO BE STEADY AND INDUSTRIOUS.
Area of benefit
CITY OF NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE AND COUNTY BOROUGH OF GATESHEAD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window