WIVELSFIELD VILLAGE HALL AND RECREATION GROUND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide recreation and leisure facilities for the inhabitants of Wivelsfield and its neighbourhood and a suitable venue for playgroup, clubs and societies. Main activities are to run the village hall together with the recreation ground, sports pavilion and annexe, children's play area and car park.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 27 September 1978: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Callaghan | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Wallis | Trustee | 05 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Corbett | Trustee | 08 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Burton | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Burton | Trustee | 25 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rhonda Marion Janes | Trustee | 15 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANN SAVIDGE | Trustee | 31 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Harty | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BLUNDEN | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|||||
ANDREW LESLIE SAVIDGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £71.02k | £36.94k | £45.02k | £65.29k | £57.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.63k | £27.43k | £58.31k | £79.29k | £47.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.37k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 27 SEPTEMBER 1978 AS AMENDED ON 06 NOV 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WIVELSFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE, FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WIVELSFIELD AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Springfields
Ditchling Road
Wivelsfield
HAYWARDS HEATH
RH17 7RF
- Phone:
- 01444471664
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window