Financial history THE CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 235124
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.20k £10.65k £8.79k £6.65k £9.02k
Total expenditure £8.35k £10.60k £10.65k £6.43k £6.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A