LEO BAECK INSTITUTE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Undertaking and promoting research into the history of German-speaking Jews, publishing, organising conferences, seminars and lectures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MYERS | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Julia Babette Sarah Neuberger | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
Simon Adler | Trustee | 12 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Stefanie Schuler-Springorum | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Cathy Gelbin | Trustee | 01 August 2010 |
|
|
||||||
Dr DAVID RECHTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £195.79k | £173.39k | £168.29k | £345.94k | £335.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.99k | £157.44k | £166.01k | £283.46k | £356.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 JULY 1963 AS AMENDED BY SEPCIAL RESOLUTION OF 1 DECEMBER 1963
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, ASSIST IN AND ORGANIZE THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY OF GERMAN JEWRY IN ALL ITS RELIGIOUS, SOCIAL, POLITICAL, SCIENTIFIC AND OTHER ASPECTS.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND FOREIGN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Podium Space Ltd
44 Russell Square
LONDON
WC1B 4JP
- Phone:
- 02078825690
- Email:
- info@leobaeck.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window