Accounts and annual returns TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNEXION WITH HATCH BEAUCHAMP BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 235239
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 12 September 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 20 June 2014 232 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2011 26 October 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2010 31 October 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 Not Required