CHARITY OF GEORGE HENRY BALL
Charity Number: 235329
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help the poor members of Morice Baptist Church
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2007
Total income: £59
Total expenditure: £59
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
- Plymouth City
Governance
Registration history:
- 01 July 1964: Standard registration
- 02 November 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68 | £69 | £39 | £59 | |
|
Total expenditure | £68 | £69 | £39 | £59 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 19 February 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 30 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 24 March 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 7/11/1924. U.V. 246 P.213.
Charitable objects
TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONG POOR MEMBERS OF THE CONGREGATION OF MORICE SQUARE BAPTIST CHURCH
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
DEVONPORT
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window