WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purposes Relief of Poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 16 July 1969: Standard registration
- SCHOOL AND POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- WEAVERHAM SCHOOL AND POORS LAND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Edwards | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Rev Paul Martin Withington | Trustee | 15 November 2018 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN MICHAEL JARDINE WILSON | Trustee | 14 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||
David Hall | Trustee | 10 October 2014 |
|
|||||||||
JOHN JEREMY COLLIER FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.52k | £1.55k | £1.58k | £1.64k | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.10k | £1.10k | £1.81k | £1.88k | £4.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF 13 JUNE 1924, 25 JULY 1930 AND 3 NOVEMBER 1961 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS UNDER S74(2)(C) & (D) OF 3 JUNE 2000 AND AS AMENDED 13 MARCH 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WHO SUPPORT ACTIVITIES FOR ALL YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PARISHES OF WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE, TO PROVIDE GRANTS OF MONEY FOR THEIR ACTIVITIES WHERE THEY BENEFIT THE YOUNG PEOPLE COLLECTIVELY IN PURSUIT OF THE CHARITY'S OBJECTIVE
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF WEAVERHAM AND ACTON BRIDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
STABLE COURT
20A LEIGH WAY
WEAVERHAM
NORTHWICH
CW8 3PR
- Phone:
- 01606852872
- Email:
- jjcfreeman37@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window