THE BOVEY TRACEY TOWN TRUST

Charity number: 235392
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Primarily: We fund the upkeep of three almshouses in Bovey Tracey. We have limited income from rental of a TV mast situated in a small field the Trust owns. The trust also distributes approx 20% of this income to local charitable organisations.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £18,823
Total expenditure: £20,384

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 June 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mark Richard Wells Trustee 24 March 2015
None on record
MARTIN CHARLES BREALEY Trustee
SAMUEL CROKER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
BOVEY TRACEY SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BOVEY TRACEY SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
JAMES LESLIE MANN Trustee
SAMUEL CROKER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
TRACEY ALMSHOUSES
Received: 14 days late
SARAH JANE OXTON Trustee
SAMUEL CROKER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
VANESSA STEER Trustee
TRACEY ALMSHOUSES
Received: 14 days late
SAMUEL CROKER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
BOVEY TRACEY SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
BOVEY TRACEY SWIMMING POOL ASSOCIATION
Recently registered

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £13.76k £12.97k £14.91k £18.31k £18.82k
Total expenditure £5.23k £35.01k £9.80k £16.38k £20.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GREENBANKS
BRADLEY ROAD
BOVEY TRACEY
NEWTON ABBOT
TQ13 9EU
Phone:
01626832821
Website:

No information available