Financial history SAMUEL CROKER'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 235393
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £2.18k £13.16k £4.31k £6.44k £7.48k
Total expenditure £2.52k £12.70k £3.72k £5.42k £7.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A