Financial history THE CLUN FOREST SHEEP BREEDERS' SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity Number: 235496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £9.92k £8.17k £7.97k £7.72k £7.58k
Total expenditure £3.79k £5.16k £5.85k £6.49k £11.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A