CHARITY KNOWN AS THE CHARITY LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cash donations are given to residents of the village of Sampford Peverell who are in need of monetary help in circumstances ie death in family; cash towards the cost of transport to visit relative who is in hospital on a long term stay; any requests for help from villagers is carefully considered by trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Devon
Governance
- 11 August 1964: Standard registration
- SAMPFORD PEVERELL CHARITIES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Cutts | Chair | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marlene Smart | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jill Howitt | Trustee | 22 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bernard O'Connell | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robin Owen Budgell | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Perks | Trustee | 28 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Hirst | Trustee | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Harding | Trustee | 10 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £580 | £598 | £635 | £909 | £788 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £418 | £208 | £8 | £359 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 11 JANUARY 1895 R V 3 P 66 U V 123 P 182
Charitable objects
INCOME TO BE DISTRIBUTED AMONGST THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF SAMPFORD PEVERELL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SAMPFORD PEVERELL
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 Lower Town
Sampford Peverell
TIVERTON
Devon
EX16 7BJ
- Phone:
- 01884820603
- Email:
- fharding@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window