THE DARLINGTON TOWN MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty, sickness, hardship and distress of those in need in the Borough of Darlington through the provision of practical and material assistance, advice, information and support and by any other charitable means, in order to improve the quality of life. To advance the Christian faith particularly but not exclusively by holding services of worship
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
23 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Darlington
Governance
- 22 June 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Penny Moon | Trustee | 08 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dermot Winters | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Dobbin | Trustee | 30 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN SIMPSON BED | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|||||
Mary Drury | Trustee | 25 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JULIA BEAN | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Derek Mills | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.47k | £22.08k | £92.83k | £23.27k | £25.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.50k | £27.54k | £28.04k | £36.73k | £39.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 23 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 04 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED IN 1959 AS AMENDED 15TH OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE A)TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF THOSE IN NEED IN THE BOROUGH OF DARLINGTON THROUGH THE PROVISION OF PRACTICAL AND MATERIAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT AND BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE SAID BENEFICIARIES QUALITY OF LIFE. B)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY HOLDING SERVICES OF WORSHIP WHEREVER APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
DARLINGTON AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Idaho Gardens
DARLINGTON
County Durham
DL1 2RG
- Phone:
- 07943251357
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window