ALMSHOUSES OF MISS ANN HOPKINS SMITH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Housing for elderly single females
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 09 July 1964: Standard registration
- 05 March 2025: Removed (Removed by application)
- OLNEY ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Chennells | Chair | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Watson | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Betsy Williams | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Laval | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matt Keen | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Howard Watkins | Trustee | 15 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROBERTS | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Jeremy Rawlings | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.01k | £58.67k | £61.87k | £66.04k | £71.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £38.89k | £51.87k | £25.37k | £23.05k | £47.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 20 DECEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 16 AUGUST 1999
Charitable objects
PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE FOR POOR AGED WIDOWS OR SPINSTERS PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF OLNEY
Area of benefit
PARISH OF OLNEY
Linked charities
- 09 July 1964 : Standard registration
- 05 March 2025 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
28 CAREY WAY
OLNEY
MK46 4DR
- Phone:
- 01234712939
- Email:
- ahs@careyway.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window