THE CAROLINE STRICKLAND HOMES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses maintained for the benefit of the residents of Cheltenham
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 August 1964: Standard registration
- 14 December 2016: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 14 December 2016: Funds transferred to 1001479 THE CHAMBERS, STRICKLAND AND HAY ALMSHOUSE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.14k | £11.99k | £19.79k | £25.61k | £27.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.55k | £28.99k | £30.83k | £32.58k | £28.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 23 June 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 17 June 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 14 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 15 June 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 11 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 03 June 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 22 May 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 10/03/1977 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/01/2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITY OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF CHELTENHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window