Accounts and annual returns DR SHERLOCKS CHARITY FOR THE POOR OF YEALAND CONYERS AND YEALAND REDMAYNE

Charity number: 235627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2023 02 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2022 02 April 2024 185 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2021 27 November 2022 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2020 09 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2019 Not Required