OXFORDSHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support to Historic Churches in Oxfordshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 25 January 1965: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Stephen John Goss | Chair | 28 April 2017 |
|
|||||
David John Hood Warr | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Natalie Victoria Merry | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Stephen Slack CBE | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr IMOGEN NICOLA COLDSTREAM | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|||||
Richard Owen Hughes | Trustee | 14 January 2019 |
|
|||||
Professor Malcolm Russell Airs | Trustee | 28 April 2017 |
|
|||||
Cynthia Ann Robinson | Trustee | 22 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Giles William Charles Dessain | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|||||
Hilary Hall | Trustee | 03 September 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 5TH MAY 1964 AS VAIED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED OF 16TH SEPTEMBER 1966 AND SCHEME OF THE COMMISSIONERS 10TH JAN 1986
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, UPKEEPAND RESTORATION OF CHURCHES ( WHICH PRHASE INCLUDES ANY CHURCH, CHAPEL OR TOHER BULDING USED FOR PUBLIC WORHTOSP FOR THE TIME BEING WHETHER BELONGING TO OR USED BY TH CHURCH OF ENGLAND OR ANY OTHER RELIGIOUS BODY) AND OF MONUMNTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FUNITURE, ORNAMENTES AN CHATTELS N SUCH CHURCHES AND OF THE CHURCHYARD AND ANY MONUMENT, BUILDING OR CHATTEL THEREIN BELONGING TO SUCH CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
THE ADMINISTRATIVE COUNTY OF OXFORD AND THE CITY OF OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 HASLEMERE GARDENS
OXFORD
OX2 8EL
- Phone:
- 01865559305
- Email:
- secretary@ohct.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window