BARTHOLOMEW THOMAS ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision and maintenance of four almshouses within the parish of Bicknoller for poor men and women over the age of 55 who have resided in or within 10 miles of the parish of Bicknoller for not less than five years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Somerset
Governance
- 21 July 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nick Evelyn | Chair | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rev Nicky Morgan | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Day | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melville Trimble | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Norfolk | Trustee | 25 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Chris Warren | Trustee | 14 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Dowding | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kate Harrison | Trustee | 30 October 2013 |
|
|||||
ROD MURPHY | Trustee | 25 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.30k | £16.32k | £18.94k | £19.71k | £21.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.97k | £3.95k | £24.72k | £8.07k | £19.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 08 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 16/09/1960 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2010 AS AMENDED ON 29/07/2014 AS AMENDED ON 27 FEB 2017 as amended on 24 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS OF THE PROTESTANT RELIGION OVER 55 YEARS OF AGE, WHO ARE INCAPACITATED FOR WORK BY AGE OR ILLNESS.
Area of benefit
UNRESTRICTED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COMBE BARN
DASHWOODS LANE
BICKNOLLER
TAUNTON
TA4 4EQ
- Phone:
- 01984656760
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window