CHARITY OF WILLIAM CHAPMAN
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
Governance
- 20 July 1964: Standard registration
- 21 June 2000: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
U.V 76 PAGE 312 AND SCHEMES OF THE 6 DECEMBER 1892 AND 23 FEBRUARY 1973 AS AMENDED ON 2 NOVEMBER 1999 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
A) 1S.OD. TO EACH AND EVERY BOY AND GIRL ATTENDING THE SUNDAY SCHOOL ATTACHED TO THE BAPTIST CHAPEL AT FOXTON. B) 2S.OD. TO EACH AND EVERY TEACHER ENGAGED IN THE SAID CHAPEL, BOTH TO BE PAID TWICE YEARLY AT WHITSUNTIDE AND AT CHRITMAS. C) FOR POOR AND NEEDY ATTENDANTS OF THE PARTICULAR BAPTIST CHAPEL AT FOXTON.
Area of benefit
FOXTON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.