THE SOLDIERS' AND AVIATORS' SCRIPTURE READERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spreading of the Gospel of Jesus Christ among the personnel in the British Army and Royal Air Force. Encouragement of Christians in the British Army and Royal Air Force to grow in their faith.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,265,140
Donations and legacies | £1.04m | |
Charitable activities | £9.92k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £122.98k | |
Other | £93.38k |
Total expenditure:
£1,333,559
Raising funds | £46.68k | |
Charitable activities | £581.19k | |
Other | £705.69k |
£1,065 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £752.37k | |
Charitable expenditure | £581.19k |
People

30 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
96 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Germany
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 December 1964: Standard registration
- 26 October 1994: Removed
- S A S R A (Working name)
- SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLONEL JOHN WILLIAM LEWIS | Chair |
|
||||||
James Humphrey Maddan | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Michael Massey | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lt. Col David Ellison | Trustee | 22 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Heath | Trustee | 29 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Richard Pryor | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
CAPT JOHN PATRICK MARK WOOLDRIDGE | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MAJOR MICHAEL CLAYDON | Trustee | 10 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
CAPT A MCLEOD | Trustee | 30 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
FLT LT J GREENALD | Trustee | 27 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
LT COL NOEL CHARLES EDWIN DAWES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LT COL WILLIAM WELLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAJOR PHIL SHANNON MBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
COL CHRISTOPHER ROBERT RIDER CBE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP BRAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LT COL CHARLES MACKENZIE ST GEORGE KIRKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN CHARLES ALLEN FRCS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13m | £1.38m | £1.27m | £1.35m | £1.27m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34m | £1.32m | £1.33m | £1.38m | £1.33m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £129.39k | £21.47k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £952.92k | £1.17m | £1.17m | £1.15m | £1.04m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.64k | £15.25k | £17.67k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £10.98k | £200 | £0 | £3.66k | £9.92k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.06k | £65.61k | £52.10k | £84.75k | £122.98k | |
|
Income - Other | £62.51k | £129.39k | £25.90k | £108.92k | £93.38k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £104.07k | £110.46k | £121.09k | £152.47k | £180.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.26m | £1.26m | £1.29m | £616.09k | £581.19k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £77.43k | £49.64k | £45.12k | £53.69k | £46.68k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £12.52k | £11.35k | £12.23k | £12.81k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £19.91k | £11.70k | £9.07k | £8.81k | £8.54k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £8.44k | £0 | £705.29k | £705.69k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £3.18m | £3.19m | £3.31m | £4.06m | £4.05m | |
|
Long-term investments | £1.84m | £1.43m | £1.38m | £491.93k | £508.84k | |
|
Other assets | £337.37k | £744.40k | £685.15k | £665.89k | £608.56k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£61.00k | -£48.00k | -£48.00k | -£46.80k | -£45.00k | |
|
Total liabilities | £85.75k | £143.04k | £73.13k | £60.33k | £45.92k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29 JUN 1937 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 13 SEP 1938 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10 NOV 1949 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 FEB 1950 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 01 MAR 1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08 JUL 1953 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11 MAY 1955 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 DEC 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17 FEB 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 JUL 2007 as amended on 20 Jul 2023 as amended on 24 May 2023 as amended on 25 May 2023 as amended on 24 May 2023
Charitable objects
4.1 The objects for which the Charity is established are, for the public benefit: (a) to advance the Christian faith in accordance with the Basis of Belief; and (b) to promote the social, moral and spiritual welfare of the personnel of HM Forces, so far as this is consistent with the first object above in particular, but not exclusively by, in any part of the world: (i) introducing servicemen and women to a practical experience of the Christian faith in support of the moral component of fighting power and their adherence to the Values & Standards of the British military; (ii) befriending servicemen and women with a view to supporting their spiritual welfare; (iii) encouraging serving Christians to witness to their colleagues by their manner of life and their spoken testimony; (iv) encouraging and facilitating regular individual and corporate Bible study and the formation of interdenominational fellowship gatherings; (v) holding talks, addresses and other events with a Bible focus; (vi) providing pastoral support for servicemen and women, where appropriate signposting them to support, medical and other welfare services; and (vii) providing social facilities for servicemen and women through which these activities may be undertaken.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ANNIE GRAHAM SEWELL (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- CHRISTCHURCH SOLDIERS' HOME FUND (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND
- GRANVILLE SMITH MEMORIAL FUND
- HILL STREET SOLDIERSS' HOME FUND (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- KING EDWARD VII SOLDIERS AND SAILORS INSTITUTE FUND
- MAJOR HAROLD WETHERELL ROWDEN (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- MARIAN LEIGH (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- MARTER READER FUND
- PERKS SOLDIERS' MEMORIAL CHARITY (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- RESIDENCE FOR A SCRIPTURE READER (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- RESIDENCE FOR THE CHRISTCHURCH SOLDIERS' HOME SCRIPTURE READER (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- RICHARD WELCH HOLLON (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- SHOEBURYNESS SOLDIERS' HOME FUND (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- STANLEY PUCKLE (CONSOLIDATED SOLDIERS' AND AIRMEN'S SCRIPTURE READERS FUND)
- WILLIAM HENRY DAWSON
- 10 December 1964 : Standard registration
- 26 October 1994 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Soldiers & Airmens Scripture
Readers Association
Havelock House
Barrack Road
ALDERSHOT
GU11 3NP
- Phone:
- 03000301302
- Email:
- Execdir@sasra.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window