TOWN LAND

Charity number: 235718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a small set amount to pensioners in the village of Walton and Kimcote who have asked for their name to be considered for an annual set amount (depending on the numbers requesting and the amount available).

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £213
Total expenditure: £135

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 October 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOANNE TAYLOR Chair
CHARITY OF ELIZA WARD
Received: On time
CHARITY OF ROBERT BRYAN
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF THOMAS DURRAD
Received: On time
MARTIN GODDARD Trustee
CHARITY OF ELIZA WARD
Received: On time
CHARITY OF ROBERT BRYAN
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF THOMAS DURRAD
Received: On time
LINDA GODDARD Trustee
CHARITY OF ROBERT BRYAN
Received: On time
EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION OF THOMAS DURRAD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £189 £192 £195 £247 £213
Total expenditure £225 £0 £195 £135 £135
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 15 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 August 2024 289 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
YEW HOUSE
HALL LANE
WALTON
LUTTERWORTH
LE17 5RP
Phone:
01455 371626
Website:

No information available