BIBLE TEXT PUBLICITY MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE TRUST DISPLAYS VERSES FROM THE BIBLE IN PUBLIC SPACES, FOR EXAMPLE ACROSS THE RAILWAY NETWORK, LONDON UNDERGROUND, ON BUSES, IN PEDESTRIAN AREAS. THE TRUST MAINTAINS A WEB SITE FOR PROMOTIONAL AND INFORMATION PURPOSES. THERE IS ALSO A HELP LINE MANNED BY AN EXPERIENCED TRUSTEE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 14 August 1964: Standard registration
- BTPM (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN CHRISTOPHER LAWRENCE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Stephen Edwards | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carl Hickson Lee | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
DYLIS GEORGE | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Wendy Mugford | Trustee | 15 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mr P A Brown | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
STEVE DUNN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEFF POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.78k | £19.28k | £27.71k | £24.02k | £29.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.67k | £22.33k | £34.31k | £34.58k | £35.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MINUTES OF MEETING HELD 24 JULY 1941 AS AMENDED BY DECLARATION OF TRUST ADOPTED 22 NOVEMBER 2010.
Charitable objects
THE DISPLAY OF BIBLE TEXTS POSTERS ON HOARDINGS; RAILWAY STATIONS AND IN TRAINS ETC. FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE GOSPEL
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Norfolk Close
MALDON
Essex
CM9 6BA
- Phone:
- 07368840294
- Email:
- info@btpm.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window