FRANCES HODGSON MEMORIAL FUND

Charity number: 235787
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our charity is very small and exists to help individuals who are in need or suffering hardship. We can pay for such items as fuel costs during the winter, car repairs, domestic white goods, help with special needs. The area we cover is Alston Moor

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 13 March 2024

Total income: £776
Total expenditure: £798

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cumbria

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 1964: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALSTON UNITED CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV MARK CHRISTIAN VICTOR NASH-WILLIAMS Chair 20 January 2015
None on record
Brian Cooper Trustee 25 January 2022
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Elizabeth Jeanette Haslam Trustee 28 September 2021
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
JAMES McCARRY Trustee 12 January 2021
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Sheila Wyatt Trustee 03 September 2019
ALSTON GOODS SHED TRUST
Received: On time
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Aileen Ellwood Trustee 03 September 2019
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
ELAINE GREW Trustee 03 September 2018
GARRIGILL OLD SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: On time
FAIRHILL ESTATE
Received: On time
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time
Jacqueline Hodson Trustee
ALSTON WITH GARRIGILL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 13/03/2020 13/03/2021 13/03/2022 13/03/2023 13/03/2024
Total gross income £296 £5.48k £1.85k £3.26k £776
Total expenditure £475 £2.97k £1.40k £2.13k £798
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 13 March 2024 18 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 13 March 2023 08 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 13 March 2022 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 13 March 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 13 March 2020 05 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 13 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 TOWNFOOT
ALSTON
CA9 3HX
Phone:
01434 381193
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available