SS. JOHN AND ELIZABETH CHARITY

Charity number: 235822
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a hospital for the reception, care and treatment of patients without distinction and, in particular, for patients requiring palliative care, and to serve the sick and dying, and to care for the physical, spiritual and emotional needs of patients irrespective of nationality or religion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 November 1967: Standard registration
  • 09 September 1993: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN AND ST ELIZABETH (Working name)
  • SS. JOHN AND ELIZABETH HOSPITAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THE HOSPITAL OF ST JOHN AND ST ELIZABETH Trustee 01 April 1993
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £58.67m £55.67m £59.93m £74.44m £66.66m
Total expenditure £55.09m £53.95m £56.98m £67.48m £70.38m
Income from government contracts £3.16m £9.55m £3.53m £3.89m £3.96m
Income from government grants N/A £121.00k £61.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.33m £1.04m £4.21m £12.77m £1.58m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £749.00k £138.00k £448.00k £353.00k
Income - Charitable activities £56.39m £53.84m £55.57m £61.20m £64.67m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £49.00k £38.00k £19.00k £24.00k £58.00k
Income - Other £897.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £105.00k £333.00k £3.50m £10.71k £417.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £53.94m £53.18m £56.19m £66.47m £69.24m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.15m £762.00k £799.00k £1.01m £1.14m
Expenditure - Governance £427.00k £164.00k £406.19k £328.00k £162.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £53.84m £60.89m £80.37m £82.71m £82.23m
Long-term investments £763.00k £810.00k £934.00k £837.00k £922.00k
Other assets £15.75m £29.25m £17.87m £26.98m £24.39m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £17.36m £36.19m £41.34m £45.83m £47.70m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 24 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 22 December 2023 52 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 22 December 2023 52 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 27 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 27 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
LETTER DATED 14TH MARCH 1950 AND AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION MADE ON THE 27TH JUNE 1996 UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE, REPLACEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF CHILDRENS' WARD EQUIPMENT.(NOW AMALGAMATED INTO MAIN CHARITY)
Area of benefit
@
Registration history
  • 21 November 1967 : Standard registration
  • 09 September 1993 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
Hospital St. John & St. Elizabeth
60 Grove End Road
LONDON
NW8 9NH
Phone:
02074328240