Charity overview HEWITT HOMES

Charity number: 206611-3
Linked charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 1 FEBRUARY 1955 AND SCHEMES OF 25 NOVEMBER 1963, DEEDS DATED 29 AUGUST 1968 AND 25 FEBRUARY 1974 AND SCHEME DATED 20 MAY 1998. as amended on 01 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 2) THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE TO PERSONS WHO ARE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 3) THE TRUSTEES MAY MAINTAIN A HOME OR HOMES FOR SUCH PERSONS. 4) THE TRUSTEES MAY MAKE CONDITIONS OF APPOINTING A RESIDENT THAT THEY MUST: A) CONTRIBUTE A WEEKLY SUM (WHICH MUST NOT CAUSE THE RESIDENT HARDSHIP) TOWARDS THE COST OF MAINTAINING THE HOMES AND ESSENTIAL SERVICES IN THEM; B) CONTRIBUTE TOWARDS THE COST OF LIGHTING AND HEATING THE HOMES AND PROVIDING HOT WATER FOR THEM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 06 August 1964: Standard registration
Other names
  • HEWITT HOMES FOR GENTLE POOR (Previous name)
This charity is a linked charity of