THE BELL HOSTEL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Gives Grants to Individuals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- East Sussex
Governance
- 21 July 1964: Standard registration
- 12 November 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 12 November 2024: Funds transferred to 285337 CHICHESTER DIOCESAN ASSOCIATION FOR FAMILY SUPPORT...
- THE BELL HOSTEL (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.10k | £5.08k | £5.08k | £5.30k | £3.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £5.00k | £10.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURES OF 1ST JUNE 1892 AND 17TH JUNE 1901 IN U.V.197 P.401 AND SCHEME OF 11TH JULY 1919
Charitable objects
FOR USE AS A DAY SERVICE HOSTEL FOR UNMARRIED MOTHERS WHERE THEY AND THEIR CHILDREN CAN LIVE AND THE CHILDREN BE CARED FOR AT SUCH TIMES AS THE MOTHERS ARE OUT AT WORK.
Area of benefit
EASTBOURNE AND ELSEWHERE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window