THE HAPPY WANDERERS AMBULANCE ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Transport for disabled and elderly infirm people, provided by voluntary drivers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 10 November 1966: Standard registration
- THE HAPPY WANDERERS AMBULANCE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR LES SUDRON | Chair |
|
||||||||
Alastair Pollard | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Suzanne Margaret Thorp | Trustee | 11 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
John Moore | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|||||||
James Andrew Barff | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Nigel Martin Sykes | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Janet Elizabeth Allen | Trustee | 14 June 2018 |
|
|
||||||
COLIN TOWSE | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT James BLACKBURN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MIKE GREENBERG | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.27k | £9.73k | £13.24k | £23.51k | £7.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.22k | £7.46k | £6.96k | £24.53k | £12.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17/09/1964 AND RULES ADOPTED 29/09/1966 AS AMENDED 15/05/1985 AND 19/02/1986 AND 16/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR OLDER PEOPLE AND ANY INDIVIDUAL WITH A DISABILITY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL PARTY, NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS OPINION, RACE, COLOUR, AGE OR FINANCIAL MEANS, SUCH RELIEF TO TAKE THE FORM OF FREE TRANSPORT OF SUCH PERSONS TO HOMES, HOSPITALS, PLACES OF ENTERTAINMENT OR WORSHIP, HOLIDAY RESORTS OR ALTERNATIVELY FREE TRANSPORT OF VISITORS TO SUCH PERSONS TO PROVIDE ENTERTAINMENT OR ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED-IN PRACTICE HARROGATE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 27 Tewit Well Gardens
Tewit Well Road
Harrogate
HG2 8JG
- Phone:
- 01423569884
- Email:
- mmgreenberg@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window