Financial history ST AUGUSTINE'S HAGGERSTON PARISH HALL TRUST

Charity Number: 235882
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2005 31/12/2006 31/12/2007 31/12/2008 31/12/2009
Total gross income £250 £133 £144 £162 £167
Total expenditure £235 £133 £144 £160 £167
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A