ST AUGUSTINE'S HAGGERSTON PARISH HALL TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Augustine's Haggerston Parish Hall Trust is affiliated to St Chad's Church, Haggerston, and provides financial support to the work of the church. This includes contributions towards the costs of the upkeep of the church and towards its charitable work in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hackney
Governance
- 03 October 1968: Standard registration
- 27 January 2011: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2005 | 31/12/2006 | 31/12/2007 | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £250 | £133 | £144 | £162 | £167 | |
|
Total expenditure | £235 | £133 | £144 | £160 | £167 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 18 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | 06 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | 05 August 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 24 July 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 27 April 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 13TH MARCH 1929
Charitable objects
THE UPKEEP OF ST. AUGUSTINE'S PARISH HALL YORKTON STREET, HACKNEY ROAD, LONDON E.2.
Area of benefit
HACKNEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window