Financial history DATCHET UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 235891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £32.24k £24.00k £27.45k £28.36k £29.00k
Total expenditure £26.21k £16.00k £38.57k £33.90k £25.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A