Accounts and annual returns THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY BIRLINGHAM

Charity number: 235904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 August 2020 On Time Download Open in new window