Financial history THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY BIRLINGHAM

Charity number: 235904
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £25.61k £27.30k £30.36k £28.33k £30.01k
Total expenditure £16.30k £9.13k £36.35k £15.19k £36.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A