Linked charities THE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY BIRLINGHAM
Charity number: 235904

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 11 MARCH 1952 AND 24 JUNE 1971, AS AMENDED BY A RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 1996 PASSED UNDER SECTION 75 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993.
Charitable objects
FOR THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMHOUSES FOR POOR OLD PERSONS OF GOOD CHARACTER, BEING RESIDENTS FOR NOT LESS THAN TWO YEARS OF THE PARISH OF BIRLINGHAM, AND WHO FROM AGE, ILL-HEALTH, ACCIDENT OR INFIRMITY ARE WHOLLY OR IN PART UNABLE TO MAINTAIN THEMSELVES BY THEIR OWN EXERTIONS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BIRLINGHAM
Registration history
- 12 August 1964 : Standard registration
- 13 March 1996 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.